+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Act No. 39
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date 05/10/17
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Ratified R 62
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Recalled from Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-93 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
May 2, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 23
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor