+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Rutherford, GM Smith, Cobb-Hunter, King, Mitchell, Hart, KR Crawford, White, Finlay, MS McLeod, Vick, Knight, Goldfinch, RL Brown, Whipper, Hosey, Mack, Clemmons, Hardwick, HA Crawford, Loftis, GR Smith, Clyburn
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-22-13
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor