+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced and read first time
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Chumley, Delleney, Burns, Long, G.R.Smith, Bedingfield, V.S.Moss, Herbkersman, Yow, Hixon, King
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
March 28, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 15
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor