+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Act No. 86
- Effective date 11/24/19
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Ratified R 107
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled for ratification
- Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0
- Conference report adopted
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
- Conference report received and adopted
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Thigpen, Yow, Bennett
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Grooms, Johnson, Climer
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-0 Nays-115
- Non-concurrence in Senate amendment
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Read second time
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Transportation
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced and read first time
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Amended
- Read second time
- Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 3-27-19
- Member request name added as sponsor: R.Williams
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Brown, Erickson, Bradley, Huggins, Forrest, Taylor
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-26-19
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (5)
May 21, 2019: To adopt the conference report
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 4
May 21, 2019: Adopt Conference Report
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 7
May 9, 2019: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Nays: 115
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 4
May 8, 2019: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 4
March 27, 2019: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 15
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor