+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Act No. 151
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date 04/07/14
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Ratified R 160
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-33 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Education
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced and read first time
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Member request name added as sponsor: Pitts, Vick, Harrell
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
March 18, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 3
April 24, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 16
- Absent: 5