+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (33)
On October 7, 2020 in the House:
- Act No. 175
- Effective date 09/29/20
On September 29, 2020 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On September 25, 2020 in the House:
- Ratified R 176
On September 24, 2020 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On September 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On September 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Read second time
- Amended
- Recalled from Committee on Judiciary
- Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Gilliard
- Roll call Yeas-112 Nays-0
- Amended
- Read second time
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-3-19
- Member request name added as sponsor: Rivers, S.Williams
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
- Member request name added as sponsor: Brown, Weeks
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: R.Williams, Davis
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Anderson, Hewitt
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Funderburk
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Cobb-Hunter
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Taylor
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Hixon
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
September 24, 2020: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 6
September 23, 2020: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
April 3, 2019: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 112
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor