+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 5, 2014 in the House:
- Debate adjourned
- Scrivener's error corrected
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Recalled from Committee on Judiciary
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-29 Nays-8
- Read second time
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Amended
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Judiciary
On January 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto , Gregory, Thurmond
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
May 22, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 3