+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen , S.Martin, Allen
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
March 17, 2015: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor