+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Yow
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Crawford
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Felder
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith, Johnson, Hardee, Dillard, Robinson, Garvin, S.Williams, Sandifer
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor