+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 28, 2022 in the House:
- Act No. 232
- Effective date 06/17/22
On June 17, 2022 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On June 16, 2022 in the House:
- Ratified R 266
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-1
- Conference report received and adopted
On June 15, 2022 in the House:
- Conference report received and adopted
- Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-0
- Ordered enrolled for ratification
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed GM Smith, Rutherford, W Newton
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Rankin, Hutto, Talley
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-0 Nays-104
- Non-concurrence in Senate amendment
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Recalled from Committee on Judiciary
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
- Amended
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
- Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-3
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Young , Sabb, Matthews, Garrett, M.Johnson
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Govan, Thigpen
- Roll call Yeas-113 Nays-2
- Read second time
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 2-24-21
- Member request name added as sponsor: Hart, Jefferson, R.Williams
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Carter
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: McGarry
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (5)
June 15, 2022: Adopt Conference Report
- Yeas: 108
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 2
June 15, 2022: To adopt the conference report
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 6
March 31, 2022: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Nays: 104
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 4
May 13, 2021: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 1
February 24, 2021: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor