+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 261
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date 07/01/16
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Ratified R 299
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-1
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Amended
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Gregory , Young, Kimpson
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-87 Nays-0
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Member request name added as sponsor: Bingham
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Robinson-Simpson
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
- Member request name added as sponsor: Weeks, Whipper
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (4)
June 2, 2016: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
June 2, 2016: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 21
- Absent: 5
April 29, 2015: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 87
- Present/NV: 32
- Absent: 5
April 28, 2015: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor