+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Recommitted to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed,. 3-1-17
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Finlay
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor