+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Act No. 23
- Effective date 05/03/13
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified R 34
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amended
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Judiciary
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
- Member request name added as sponsor: Gilliard
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Recalled from Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
April 24, 2013: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 19
- Absent: 4
April 18, 2013: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
April 9, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 3