+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Member request name removed as sponsor: K.O.Johnson
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Henegan, Garvin, Matthews, Howard, K.O.Johnson
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Blackwell
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor