+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to delegation from Aiken County
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Ratified R 74
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
- Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Amended
- Read second time
- Roll call Yeas-92 Nays-0
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Aiken Delegation
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Aiken Delegation
- Introduced and read first time
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar
+ − Votes (2)
May 10, 2017: To concur
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 1
May 4, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 21
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor