+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 29, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Chumley
On June 21, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Herbkersman
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Magnuson, Burns
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Gagnon
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Murray
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Jones
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On December 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor