+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Thayer
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Bennett
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Caskey
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor