+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Act No. 144
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date 04/04/18
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Ratified R 152
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reconsider vote whereby read third time and returned with amendments
- Recalled from House
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
- Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Massey , McElveen, Senn
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Member request name added as sponsor: Ballentine, King, Henegan, West
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 2-1-17
- Member request name added as sponsor: Wheeler
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Bedingfield, V.S.Moss
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
- Member request name added as sponsor: Knight, Hixon, Elliott, Henderson
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Putnam, Clary, Hamilton, Yow, W.Newton, Kirby, Erickson
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
March 22, 2018: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 104
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 8
March 8, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 4
February 1, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 17
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor