+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Act No. 69
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date 5/19/17
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Ratified R 104
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-35 Nays-3
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Turner , Malloy, Kimpson, Climer, Goldfinch
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-3
- Read second time
- Amended
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
May 10, 2017: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 15
- Absent: 5
May 9, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 3
February 14, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor