+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 23, 2020 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thurs., Sept 24
On September 22, 2020 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wednesday, Sept. 23
On September 16, 2020 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thurs., 09-17-20
- Debate adjourned
On September 15, 2020 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 09-16-20
On May 12, 2020 in the House:
- Recalled from Committee on Judiciary
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
- Amended
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Turner , Hutto, M.B.Matthews, Goldfinch, Talley
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
April 10, 2019: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor