+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-17
- Read second time
- Amended
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Jefferson, Willis, Pitts, Hill, Taylor, Delleney, Hart, JE Smith, Sandifer, Southard, Knight, Ott, Douglas, McKnight, Ridgeway, Bamberg, Williams, George, Daning, Crosby, Tallon, Kirby, Whipper, RL Brown, Hosey, Corley, Wells, Clary, Sottile, Gilliard, Henegan, Chumley, Burns, Bannister, Hicks, Loftis, Toole, Forrester, GR Smith, Ballentine, Robinson-Simpson, Dilliard, Spires, Norrell, Pope, Funderburk, Weeks, DC Moss, Limehouse, GM Smith, Norman, Gambrell
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (4)
March 4, 2015: Table Amendment number 2
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 46
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 3
March 4, 2015: Table Amendment number 8
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 36
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 3
March 4, 2015: Adopt Amendment number 10
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 92
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 3
March 4, 2015: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 3