+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Act No. 6
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date 4/5/17
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Ratified R 13
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-3
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Transportation
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced and read first time
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Amended
- Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-3
- Read second time
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 3-1-17
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 2-28-17
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Willis, Hiott, Clary, Kirby, Anderson, Crosby, Danning, Bennett, Long, Magnuson, Martin, Sandifer, Whitmire, GR Smith, JE Smith, Clemmons, Weeks, Bradley, Hill, Jefferson
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 2-15-17
- Member request name added as sponsor: Williams
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Felder
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
On December 15, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (3)
March 29, 2017: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 100
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 3
March 22, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 2
March 2, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 100
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor