+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 10, 2019 in the House:
- Act No. 108
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date 05/13/19
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Ratified R 57
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-0
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Recalled from Chesterfield Delegation
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Lucas, Henegan
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Chesterfield Delegation
- Introduced and read first time
On December 18, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Chesterfield Delegation
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
April 4, 2019: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 19
- Absent: 9