+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Johnson
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Thayer
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Loftis
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: V.S.Moss
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: McCravy
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Magnuson, Martin, Trantham
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
On December 15, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor