+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 11, 2022 in the House:
- Conference report received and adopted
- Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed West, Bradley, Kirby
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Scott, Gambrell, Climer
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
- Roll call Yeas-0 Nays-100
- Non-concurrence in Senate amendment
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced and read first time
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-95 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Bradley
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
On December 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (4)
May 11, 2022: Adopt Conference Report
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 5
January 27, 2022: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Nays: 100
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 7
January 25, 2022: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 2
March 2, 2021: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 27
- Absent: 2