+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Act No. 23
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date 5/9/17
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Ratified R 41
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-1
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Member request name added as sponsor: Anderson
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 1-31-17
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Knight
- Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works
- Member request name added as sponsor: Taylor
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Govan
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Daning
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
On December 15, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (3)
April 25, 2017: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 7
April 18, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
January 31, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor