+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Judiciary
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-1
- Read second time
- Member request name added as sponsor: W.J.McLeod, Stavrinakis
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Weeks
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
January 27, 2015: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor