+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committed to Committee on Judiciary
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
On December 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
February 6, 2013: Table the Motion to Recommit the Bill
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 68
- Present/NV: 20
- Absent: 5