+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: King
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Simmons
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Henegan
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
On December 18, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor