+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Taylor
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Atwater
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Ballentine
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
On December 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Prefiled