+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 1, 2022 in the House:
- Effective date See Act for Effective Date
- Act No. 218
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- Ratified R 246
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-4
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On May 11, 2022 in the House:
- Debate adjourned
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 4, 2022 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On July 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Senn , Malloy, Kimpson, Matthews, Adams, Garrett, Gustafson
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced and read first time
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-13
- Read second time
- Amended
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-12-21
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-6-21
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Pope, Cobb-Hunter, Simrill, Ott, Blackwell, Taylor, Caskey, McGarry, Bustos, Cogswell, Bennet, Willis, B. Cox, Hiott, Allison, Magnuson, King, Henderson-Myers, JA Moore, Brawley, J.L. Johnson, Hosey, Cluburn, Govan, Henegan, Kirby, Herbkersman, Bailey, Hewitt, Garvin, Alexander, Oremus, R. Williams, Bamberg, McCravy, Jefferson, Sandifer, M. Smith, Wheeler, McGinnis, Hardee, West, Weeks, Hyde, Bruyant, Daning, Gilliam and Dillard
- Amended
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Bradley
- Debate adjourned
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Wooten, Hixon
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: McGarry
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (5)
May 12, 2022: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 103
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 5
May 4, 2022: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
May 12, 2021: Table Amendment 6 Amendment number 6
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 32
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 4
May 12, 2021: Table motion to recommit
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 4
May 12, 2021: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 100
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 4