+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Huggins, T.Moore
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: McGarry
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Yow
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Caskey
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
On December 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor