+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
- Member request name added as sponsor: Clemmons
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-5-19
- Member request name added as sponsor: Crawford
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 18, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
March 5, 2019: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 106
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 3