+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: M.M.Smith
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Pope
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Willis
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Bradley, Trantham, D.C.Moss, Bryant, G.R.Smith, Martin, Davis, McCravy, Kimmons, Hixon, Gagnon, West, Atkinson, Sandifer, Whitmire, Yow, Lowe, Jordan, Fry, McGinnis, Erickson, Simrill, Wooten, Ballentine, Caskey
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: G.M.Smith
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Crawford, W.Newton
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Huggins
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: W.Cox
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Herbkersman
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Jones
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: McCabe
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Hardee
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: May, Dabney
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor