+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Act No. 49
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date 5/19/17
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Ratified R 70
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-2
- Read second time
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Tallon, Pope, Hixon, Taylor, Blackwell, Felder, Magnuson, Martin, Cole, Allison, Chumley, Daning, Arrington, Collins, Bennett, Elliott, Atkinson, Rhyal, Forrest, Atwater, Ott, Cobb-Hunter, Ballentine, Huggins, Bannister, Whitmire, Ridgeway, Douglas, Caskey, Finlay, Henegan, Govan, Hewitt
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Corrections and Penology
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Penology
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
May 10, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 15
- Absent: 5
March 23, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor