+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Act No. 29
- Effective date 05/06/21
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Ratified R 42
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-117 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Education
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced and read first time
On December 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (2)
April 28, 2021: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 117
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 3
March 16, 2021: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor