+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Act No. 28
- Effective date See Act for Effective Date
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Ratified R 41
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
- Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-1
- Read second time
- Amended
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Family and Veterans' Services
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services
- Introduced and read first time
On December 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (3)
April 29, 2021: To concur
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
April 22, 2021: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 104
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 9
March 16, 2021: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3