+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Act No. 3
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date 4/5/17
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Ratified R 9
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-73 Nays-29
- Read second time
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Sandifer, Toole, Forrest, West, Whitmire, Allison, Bedingfield, Anderson, Loftis, Weeks, Hart, Felder, Hixon
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-32 Nays-8
- Read second time
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Debate interrupted
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special order, set for January 31, 2017
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (6)
March 22, 2017: Table Motion to Adjourn Debate
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 34
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 7
March 22, 2017: Table Amendment number 1
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 31
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 7
March 22, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 7
February 7, 2017: To lay on the table Amendment number 1
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 2
February 7, 2017: To lay on the table Amendment number 2
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
February 7, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor