+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Act No. 42
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date 05/16/19
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Ratified R 62
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to House with amendments
- House amendment amended
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto , Shealy, Young
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (4)
May 9, 2019: To concur
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 3
May 9, 2019: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 21
- Absent: 3
May 7, 2019: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 105
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 4
January 24, 2019: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor