+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced and read first time
On December 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
February 27, 2019: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor