+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Act No. 72
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date 01/01/16
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified R 101
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0
- Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with amendments
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-84 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On December 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (3)
June 4, 2015: To concur
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 2
June 3, 2015: Adoption of Bill
- Yeas: 84
- Present/NV: 35
- Absent: 4
April 23, 2015: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor