+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
- Read third time and sent to House
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-26 Nays-18
- Amended
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
- Amended
- Read second time
- Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-0
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy , Campsen, Hembree, McElveen, Thurmond
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2013: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 2
February 12, 2013: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor