+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
May 17, 2016: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor