+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 16, 2014 in the House:
- Act No. 232
On June 13, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date 06/03/14
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Ratified R 237
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
- Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
- Recalled from Education and Public Works
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-1
- Read second time
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Education
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 15
- Absent: 7
April 15, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor