+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 17, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 269
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date 06/06/16
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Signed By Governor
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Ratified R 239
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Reconsidered
- Recommitted to Committee on Ways and Means
- Amended
- Read second time
- Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 6-1-16
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-31-16
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Finance
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
June 2, 2016: To concur
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 4
June 1, 2016: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 17
- Absent: 4
April 26, 2016: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1