+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-46 Nays-0
- Read second time
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Family and Veterans' Services
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
March 4, 2020: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 46
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor