+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Aiken Delegation
- Introduced and read first time
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor