+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (62)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0857)
- Enacted, Chapter 857 (effective - see bill)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB984ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
On April 18, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 11, 2006 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 27, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB984ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On March 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 2006 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 064021504-H2
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senators: Stolle, Norment, Howell
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Delegates: Sherwood, Griffith, Joannou
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On March 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2006 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by House (2-Y 97-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 97-N)
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB984S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 064884504-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 064884504-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB984H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 063959504-H1
- Read second time
On February 11, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 1-N)
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety (Sherwood)
- Committee substitute printed 063959504-H1
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Courts of Justice sub-committee: Criminal Law
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 061186134
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (12)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
March 11, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 11, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
March 7, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2006: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 97-N)
March 1, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2006: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
February 10, 2006: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor