+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0643)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 643 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/11/16
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB27ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Passed House with amendments (92-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Read third time
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB27S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16104435D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 16104435D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On December 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100580D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 3, 2016: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2016: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 24, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2016: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor