+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Requires 26 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
- Senate sustained Governor's veto (19-Y 20-N)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB310ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Passed House (69-Y 31-N)
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 31-N)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (16-Y 6-N)
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Appointments
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (21-Y 17-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (19-Y 18-N)
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB310S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14103996D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14103996D-S1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 6-N)
On January 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102758D